US HB2234 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Terminates (1) the taxpayer election to designate $3 of income tax liability for financing of presidential election campaigns, (2) the Presidential Election Campaign Fund, and (3) the Presidential Primary Matching Payment Account. The Department of the Treasury must transfer the funds remaining in the Presidential Election Campaign Fund to the 10-Year Pediatric Research Initiative Fund. The National Institutes of Health (NIH) must prioritize certain pediatric research that does not replicate existing NIH research activities.
Title
Jonny Wade Pediatric Cancer Research Act
Sponsors
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Mark Walker [R-NC] | Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] |
Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB290 (Related) 2019-01-08 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB1827 (Related) 2019-03-18 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3225 (Related) 2020-01-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB1827 (Related) 2019-03-18 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3225 (Related) 2020-01-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Cancer
Child health
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government trust funds
Health programs administration and funding
Medical research
Research administration and funding
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Child health
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Government trust funds
Health programs administration and funding
Medical research
Research administration and funding
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2234/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2234/BILLS-116hr2234ih.pdf |