US HB224 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts certain public-buildings and public-works contracts from periodic inflation adjustments to a dollar threshold that influences the applicability of a policy, procedure, requirement, or restriction to such a contract.
Title
To amend section 1908 of title 41, United States Code, to exempt certain contracts from the periodic inflation adjustments to an acquisition-related dollar threshold.
Sponsors
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Government operations and politics
Inflation and prices
Public contracts and procurement
Government operations and politics
Inflation and prices
Public contracts and procurement
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/224/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr224/BILLS-116hr224ih.pdf |