US HB2242 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 388.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 388.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the definition of critical services in the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act to include solid waste management, stormwater management, public housing, transportation infrastructure, and medical care.
Title
To amend the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act to include certain services in the definition of critical services, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Randy Weber [R-TX] | Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-04 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 388. |
2020-09-04 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 116-485. |
2019-09-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-09-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-19 | House | Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management Discharged. |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-04-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Floods and storm protection
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Solid waste and recycling
State and local finance
Emergency management
Floods and storm protection
Government buildings, facilities, and property
Solid waste and recycling
State and local finance