US HB2245 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 235-65-1)
Status: Passed on August 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-07 - Became Public Law No: 111-44.
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 235-65-1)
Status: Passed on August 7 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-07 - Became Public Law No: 111-44.
Summary
New Frontier Congressional Gold Medal Act - Authorizes the President to present gold medals, on behalf of Congress, to: (1) the astronauts of the Apollo 11 mission to the surface of the moon, Neil A. Armstrong (the first human to walk on the moon), Edwin E. "Buzz" Aldrin Jr. (pilot of the lunar module Eagle and second person to walk on the moon), and Michael Collins (pilot of their command module Columbia) in recognition of the first lunar landing, on July 20, 1969; and (2) John Herschel Glenn, the first American to orbit the Earth, on February 20, 1962.
Title
New Frontier Congressional Gold Medal Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-07 | Became Public Law No: 111-44. | |
2009-08-07 | Signed by President. | |
2009-07-27 | Presented to President. | |
2009-07-22 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2009-07-21 | Cleared for White House. | |
2009-07-21 | Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7808) | |
2009-07-20 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-07-20 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 390 - 0 (Roll no. 595). (text: CR H8385-8386) | |
2009-07-20 | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H8389-8390) | |
2009-07-20 | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. | |
2009-07-20 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2245. | |
2009-07-20 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8385-8387) | |
2009-07-20 | Mr. Grayson moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2009-05-05 | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. | |
2009-05-05 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1061-1062, H5137) |
Same As/Similar To
SB951 (Related) 2010-09-23 - Message received in the Senate: Returned to the Senate pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 1653.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/2245/all-info |