US HB2249 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires review of the service records of certain decorated World War I veterans to determine whether they should be awarded the Medal of Honor for valor during that war. Specifically, the Secretary of the Army or the Secretary of the Navy shall review the records of any African American, Asian American, Hispanic American, Jewish American, or Native American war veteran who was recommended for review by a veterans service organization and who, for action that occurred between April 6, 1917, and November 11, 1918 was awarded the Distinguished Service Cross or the Navy Cross, was awarded the Croix de Guerre with Palm by the government of France, or was recommended for a Medal of Honor. If a review indicates that the award is warranted, a recommendation shall be made to the President to award the Medal of Honor to that veteran.
Title
World War I Valor Medals Review Act
Sponsors
Rep. French Hill [R-AR] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] |
Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] | Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] | Rep. Chip Roy [R-TX] |
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] | Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] |
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA] | Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] |
Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Bradley Byrne [R-AL] | Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI] |
Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Liz Cheney [R-WY] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH] | Rep. Dan Crenshaw [R-TX] | Rep. Brad Wenstrup [R-OH] | Rep. Vicente Gonzalez [D-TX] |
Rep. Jim Costa [D-CA] | Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC] | Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] | Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO] |
Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2019-04-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1218 (Same As) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Conflicts and wars
Government studies and investigations
Military history
Personnel records
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Veterans' organizations and recognition
Conflicts and wars
Government studies and investigations
Military history
Personnel records
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Veterans' organizations and recognition
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2249/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2249/BILLS-116hr2249ih.pdf |