US HB2250 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 312.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sets forth provisions concerning the restoration, economic development, and conservation of, and recreational access to, certain public lands in Northern California. The bill establishes the South Fork Trinity-Mad River Restoration Area, the Northwest California Public Lands Remediation Partnership, the Trinity Lake and Del Norte County visitor centers, the Horse Mountain Special Management Area, the Elk Camp Ridge National Recreation Trail, and the Sanhedrin Conservation Management Area. The bill designates specified federal lands as components of the National Wilderness Preservation System, the North Fork Wilderness as the North Fork Eel River Wilderness, specified federal lands as potential wilderness areas, and specified segments of certain rivers and creeks and of a specified river estuary as components of the National Wild and Scenic Rivers System. Also, the bill authorizes the utilization of certain forest residues for research and development of bio-based products that result in net carbon sequestration; authorizes initiatives to restore degraded redwood forest ecosystems in the Redwood National Forest and state parks; requires studies concerning certain visitor accommodations and recreational trails in the Six Rivers, Shasta-Trinity, and Mendocino National Forests, as applicable; authorizes partnerships for trail and campground maintenance, public education, visitor contacts, and visitor center staffing on federal lands in Mendocino, Humboldt, Trinity, and Del Norte Counties; and adjusts the boundaries of the Elkhorn Ridge Wilderness.
Title
Northwest California Wilderness, Recreation, and Working Forests Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. Anna Eshoo [D-CA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] |
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] |
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] |
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] |
Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 312. |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-389. |
2019-11-20 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 11. |
2019-11-20 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-11-20 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2019-07-10 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-04-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1110 (Same As) 2019-04-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2546 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB3288 (Related) 2020-02-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2546 (Related) 2020-02-13 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB3288 (Related) 2020-02-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Air quality
California
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Crimes against animals and natural resources
Ecology
Economic development
Emergency planning and evacuation
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Fires
Fishes
Floods and storm protection
Forests, forestry, trees
Government studies and investigations
Historical and cultural resources
Hunting and fishing
Indian lands and resources rights
Insects
Lakes and rivers
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Livestock
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Motor vehicles
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pedestrians and bicycling
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Research and development
Roads and highways
Water quality
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
California
Climate change and greenhouse gases
Congressional oversight
Crimes against animals and natural resources
Ecology
Economic development
Emergency planning and evacuation
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Fires
Fishes
Floods and storm protection
Forests, forestry, trees
Government studies and investigations
Historical and cultural resources
Hunting and fishing
Indian lands and resources rights
Insects
Lakes and rivers
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Livestock
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Motor vehicles
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pedestrians and bicycling
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Research and development
Roads and highways
Water quality
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection