US HB2254 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands requirements for lead-level testing or screening as part of well-baby care under the TRICARE program of health care for members and dependents. It prescribes testing for the level of lead in the blood at the ages of both 12 and 24 months for children who may be at elevated risk of lead exposure. Test results shall be provided to state health departments (or the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention, in the case of children residing abroad). The Government Accountability Office shall study the effectiveness of such screening, testing, and treatment for lead exposure and poisoning. The Department of Defense shall maintain records concerning the year housing for military personnel was built, and members must provide notice of when their residence was built as a condition of receiving a housing allowance.
Title
To amend titles 10 and 37, United States Code, to ensure that children covered by the TRICARE program are screened and tested for lead levels, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2019-04-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1143 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1143 (Related) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Blood and blood diseases
Building construction
Child health
Congressional oversight
Environmental health
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health information and medical records
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Military facilities and property
Military medicine
Military personnel and dependents
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Worker safety and health
Blood and blood diseases
Building construction
Child health
Congressional oversight
Environmental health
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health information and medical records
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Military facilities and property
Military medicine
Military personnel and dependents
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2254/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2254/BILLS-116hr2254ih.pdf |