US HB2262 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 125-7-2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-04 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Safe Schools Improvement Act of 2009 - Amends the Safe and Drug-Free Schools and Communities Act to require: (1) states to use grants for safe and drug-free schools to collect and report information on the incidence of bullying and harassment; and (2) local educational agencies (LEAs) and schools to use subgrants to prevent and respond to incidents of bullying and harassment. Requires such LEAs or schools to: (1) notify parents and students annually of conduct prohibited in their school discipline policies, that now must include bullying and harassment; and (2) establish grievance procedures for students and parents to register complaints regarding such conduct. Includes bullying and harassment within the Act's definition of violence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Safe Schools Improvement Act of 2009

Sponsors

Rep. Gary Ackerman [D-NY]Rep. Robert Andrews [D-NJ]Rep. Brian Baird [D-WA]Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI]
Rep. Shelley Berkley [D-NV]Rep. Howard Berman [D-CA]Rep. Timothy Bishop [D-NY]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]
Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU]Rep. Rick Boucher [D-VA]Rep. Robert Brady [D-PA]Rep. Lois Capps [D-CA]
Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA]Rep. Russ Carnahan [D-MO]Rep. Christopher Carney [D-PA]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]
Rep. Jerry Costello [D-IL]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. Joseph Crowley [D-NY]Rep. Henry Cuellar [D-TX]
Rep. Kathleen Dahlkemper [D-PA]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Bill Delahunt [D-MA]
Rep. William Delahunt [D-MA]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA]
Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Bob Etheridge [D-NC]Rep. Sam Farr [D-CA]
Rep. Bob Filner [D-CA]Rep. Barney Frank [D-MA]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Bart Gordon [D-TN]
Rep. Alan Grayson [D-FL]Rep. Al Green [D-TX]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Luis Gutierrez [D-IL]
Rep. John Hall [D-NY]Rep. Phil Hare [D-IL]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Stephanie Herseth Sandlin [D-SD]
Rep. Maurice Hinchey [D-NY]Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX]Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI]Rep. Rush Holt [D-NJ]
Rep. Michael Honda [D-CA]Rep. Steve Israel [D-NY]Rep. Jesse Jackson [D-IL]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]
Rep. Patrick Kennedy [D-RI]Rep. Dale Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Mary Kilroy [D-OH]Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL]
Rep. Ron Klein [D-FL]Rep. Dennis Kucinich [D-OH]Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]
Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]
Rep. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY]Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA]
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Carolyn McCarthy [D-NY]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA]
Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Michael McMahon [D-NY]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME]
Rep. Dennis Moore [D-KS]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. James Moran [D-VA]Rep. Patrick Murphy [R-PA]
Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]
Rep. John Olver [D-MA]Rep. Solomon Ortiz [D-TX]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Ed Pastor [D-AZ]
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Pedro Pierluisi [N-PR]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Todd Platts [R-PA]
Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO]Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Silvestre Reyes [D-TX]
Sen. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL]Rep. Steven Rothman [D-NJ]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]
Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. Loretta Sanchez [D-CA]
Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA]Rep. Joe Sestak [D-PA]
Rep. Carol Shea-Porter [D-NH]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY]
Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]Rep. Zachary Space [D-OH]Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA]Rep. Fortney Stark [D-CA]
Rep. Betty Sutton [D-OH]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]
Rep. Edolphus Towns [D-NY]Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Maxine Waters [D-CA]
Rep. Henry Waxman [D-CA]Rep. Anthony Weiner [D-NY]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Robert Wexler [D-FL]
Rep. Lynn Woolsey [D-CA]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Don Young [R-AK]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-06-04 Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
2009-05-05 Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
2009-05-05 Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E1061)

Same As/Similar To

HB5184 (Related) 2010-05-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Early Childhood, Elementary, and Secondary Education.
SB3739 (Related) 2010-08-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6896-6897)

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback