US HB2281 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-18 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Drug Enforcement Administration to revise regulations to allow a practitioner to administer up to a three-day supply of narcotic drugs to an individual at one time for purposes of relieving acute withdrawal symptoms while the individual awaits arrangements for narcotic treatment. Current regulations authorize up to a one-day supply of narcotic drugs for an individual at one time, for a total of up to three days.
Title
Easy MAT for Opioid Addiction Act Easy Medication Access and Treatment for Opioid Addiction Act
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2020-11-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-11-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5811-5812) |
2020-11-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2281. |
2020-11-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5811-5813) |
2020-11-17 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-11-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 485. |
2020-11-16 | House | Committee on the Judiciary discharged. |
2020-11-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-587, Part I. |
2020-09-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB14 (Related) 2020-11-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
HB8900 (Related) 2020-12-11 - Became Public Law No: 116-215. (TXT | PDF)
HB8900 (Related) 2020-12-11 - Became Public Law No: 116-215. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of Justice
Drug Enforcement Administration (DEA)
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health
Department of Justice
Drug Enforcement Administration (DEA)
Drug therapy
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health