US HB2290 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-09-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs financial regulators—including the Federal Reserve Board, the Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency, the Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, and the National Credit Union Administration—to issue guidance relating to a government shutdown. Among other things, financial regulators must issue guidance encouraging financial institutions to modify loan terms and to extend credit to consumers and businesses affected by a shutdown, and to take steps to prevent the reporting of adverse credit information related to a shutdown. Financial regulators must also notify the public of this guidance in the event of a government shutdown, and complete a report after a government shutdown regarding the guidance's effectiveness.
Title
Shutdown Guidance for Financial Institutions Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2019-09-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-09-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7805-7806) |
2019-09-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2290. |
2019-09-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7805-7807) |
2019-09-19 | House | Ms. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-04-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2919 (Related) 2019-11-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Appropriations
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Consumer credit
Credit and credit markets
Finance and financial sector
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives
Appropriations
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Consumer credit
Credit and credit markets
Finance and financial sector
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government information and archives