US HB2296 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

FAIR Drug Pricing Act of 2019 Fair Accountability and Innovative Research Drug Pricing Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FAIR Drug Pricing Act of 2019 Fair Accountability and Innovative Research Drug Pricing Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-17HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-07-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-07-11HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
2019-07-11HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-05-21HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-04-15HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-04-12HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-04-12HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB2452 (Related) 2019-05-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
SB1391 (Related) 2019-05-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
SB1895 (Related) 2019-07-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 133.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback