US HB2302 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the methodology for calculating Old Age, Survivors, and Disability Insurance (OASDI) benefits and phases out the cap on compensation subject to Social Security taxation. The bill directs the Bureau of Labor Statistics to prepare and publish a Consumer Price Index for Elderly Consumers (CPI-E) to track cost-of-living changes for individuals age 62 or older. The Social Security Administration shall use the CPI-E to calculate the cost-of-living adjustment for OASDI benefits, where it currently uses the Consumer Price Index for Urban Wage Earners and Clerical Workers. The bill phases out and after 2025 eliminates the cap on compensation ($132,900 in 2019) subject to Social Security taxation. This change applies to both wage earners and the self-employed. The bill also changes the calculation for the primary insurance amount (the amount received by a beneficiary who elects to receive OASDI benefits at full retirement age) by including the additional earnings that are now taxed as a result of the cap elimination.
Title
Protecting and Preserving Social Security Act
Sponsors
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] |
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security. |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1132 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2389)
HB2654 (Related) 2019-05-09 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB2654 (Related) 2019-05-09 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Census and government statistics
Inflation and prices
Self-employed
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
Wages and earnings
Inflation and prices
Self-employed
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2302/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2302/BILLS-116hr2302ih.pdf |