US HB2318 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
Pending: House Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies technical requirements for National Flood Insurance Program (NFIP) rate maps. Specifically, the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) must consult with the Department of Defense, the U.S. Geological Survey, and the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration to obtain information relevant to NFIP rate maps. FEMA may include this data, as well as specified property survey information, in NFIP rate maps. The format of NFIP rate maps must conform to specified data and protocols.
Title
FIRM IT Act of 2019 Flood Insurance Rate Map Interagency Technology Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-04-12 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1144 (Same As) 2019-04-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB3872 (Related) 2019-07-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
SB2187 (Related) 2019-07-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
HB3872 (Related) 2019-07-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
SB2187 (Related) 2019-07-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Subjects
Disaster relief and insurance
Earth sciences
Finance and financial sector
Floods and storm protection
Geography and mapping
Government information and archives
Intergovernmental relations
Earth sciences
Finance and financial sector
Floods and storm protection
Geography and mapping
Government information and archives
Intergovernmental relations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2318/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2318/BILLS-116hr2318ih.pdf |