US HB2328 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-20-1)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-17 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Community Health Investment, Modernization, and Excellence Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community Health Investment, Modernization, and Excellence Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Tom O'Halleran [D-AZ]Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Adriano Espaillat [D-NY]
Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]
Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]
Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]
Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]
Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]
Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR]Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH]Rep. Peter King [R-NY]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]
Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA]Rep. Don Young [R-AK]
Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY]Rep. Scott Tipton [R-CO]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Jack Bergman [R-MI]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. Jimmy Gomez [D-CA]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]
Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY]Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA]Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY]
Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]Rep. Doug Lamborn [R-CO]
Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH]Rep. Charles Fleischmann [R-TN]Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]
Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]
Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Ralph Norman [R-SC]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Xochitl Torres Small [D-NM]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]
Rep. John Katko [R-NY]Rep. Gregorio Sablan [I-MP]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT]
Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA]Rep. Amata Radewagen [D-AS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-17HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-07-17HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-07-11HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
2019-07-11HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-06-04HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-04-16HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-04-15HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-04-15HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback