US HB2331 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-16 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 151.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-16 - Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 151.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Addresses the cybersecurity of the Small Business Administration (SBA). Specifically, it requires the SBA to report annually to Congress on (1) an assessment of SBA's information technology (IT) and cybersecurity infrastructure; (2) a strategy to increase such infrastructure; (3) a detailed account of SBA's IT equipment or interconnected system or subsystem of equipment manufactured by an entity that has its principal place of business in the People's Republic of China; and (4) any SBA cybersecurity risk or incident that occurred during two years before the report, including SBA's action to respond to or remediate it.
Title
SBA Cyber Awareness Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] |
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Tim Burchett [R-TN] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 151. |
2019-07-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5807) |
2019-07-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2331. |
2019-07-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5807-5809) |
2019-07-15 | House | Mr. Delgado moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-06-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 83. |
2019-06-13 | House | Reported by the Committee on Small Business. H. Rept. 116-114. |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
2019-04-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB772 (Related) 2019-04-01 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 52.
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
HR476 (Similar To) 2019-07-10 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB6800 (Related) 2020-07-23 - Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. Hearings held.
HR967 (Similar To) 2020-05-15 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Asia
China
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congress
Congressional oversight
Small business
Small Business Administration
China
Computer security and identity theft
Computers and information technology
Congress
Congressional oversight
Small business
Small Business Administration