US HB2333 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-96. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on December 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-96. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(Sec. 2) requires the Government Accountability Office to report on the responsibilities, workload, training, and vacancy rates of suicide prevention coordinators at the Department of Veterans Affairs.
Title
Support for Suicide Prevention Coordinators Act
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY] | Rep. Jim Banks [R-IN] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] |
Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] |
Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] | Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-11 - Senate - Passed Senate without amendment RC# 390 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-20 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-96. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-12-20 | House | Signed by President. |
2019-12-19 | House | Presented to President. |
2019-12-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-12-11 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 95 - 0. Record Vote Number: 390. (consideration: CR S6967) |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2019-05-21 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-05-21 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4039) |
2019-05-21 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2333. |
2019-05-21 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4039-4041) |
2019-05-21 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-05-17 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 46. |
2019-05-17 | House | Reported by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-70. |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2019-04-30 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-04-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-04-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1392 (Related) 2019-05-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Mental health
Veterans' medical care
Congressional oversight
Department of Veterans Affairs
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Mental health
Veterans' medical care