US HB2339 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 92-1)
Status: Introduced on April 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-13 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Reversing the Youth Tobacco Epidemic Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reversing the Youth Tobacco Epidemic Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ]Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL]Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]
Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD]Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]Rep. Lisa Rochester [D-DE]Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]
Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]Rep. Terri Sewell [D-AL]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN]Rep. Peter King [R-NY]Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY]
Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]
Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Kim Schrier [D-WA]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]
Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI]
Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS]Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH]
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]
Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. Raja Krishnamoorthi [D-IL]Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]
Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]
Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Josh Gottheimer [D-NJ]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]
Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Stacey Plaskett [D-VI]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]
Rep. Ed Case [D-HI]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]
Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]
Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]
Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]
Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL]Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]
Rep. Mary Gay Scanlon [D-PA]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-13HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
2019-11-13HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-10-16HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-04-19HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-04-18HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-04-18HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback