US HB2352 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Address issues related to preventing and responding to oil spills. Among other things, the bill requires the Department of the Interior to consult with the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration (NOAA) before approving an oil and gas lease program; authorizes the Department of Commerce to make grants to states to ensure sufficient oil spill planning and response capabilities; prohibits oil and gas leasing in certain areas of the Eastern Gulf of Mexico Planning Area, the South Atlantic Planning area, and the Straits of Florida Planning Area; sets forth provisions concerning Coast Guard responsibilities, including designating areas that are at heightened risk of oil spills and implementing measures to ameliorate that risk; establishes a Gulf Coast Regional Citizens' Advisory Council to advise on facilities and tank vessels; permits the U.S. Coast Guard or Commerce to request a National Transportation Safety Board investigation of certain accidents occurring in the Outer Continental Shelf (OCS); establishes inspection fees for OCS facilities; requires a comprehensive review of NOAA's capacity to respond to oil spills; directs the Coast Guard to evaluate and validate oil pollution containment and removal methods and technologies; requires NOAA to carry out a long-term marine environment monitoring and research program for the Gulf of Mexico; and directs the Coast Guard to publish within 12 hours an Incident Action Plan in response to an oil spill.
Title
Marine Oil Spill Prevention Act
Sponsors
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. Matt Gaetz [R-FL] |
Rep. Francis Rooney [R-FL] | Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] |
Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Tom Malinowski [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2019-04-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2019-04-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Science, Space, and Technology, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB286 (Related) 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources.
Subjects
Accidents
Advisory bodies
Alabama
Aquaculture
Aquatic ecology
Coast guard
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Emergency planning and evacuation
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Environmental technology
Florida
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Gulf of Mexico
Hunting and fishing
Intergovernmental relations
Louisiana
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Mississippi
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Oil and gas
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pollution liability
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Seafood
State and local government operations
Technology assessment
Texas
Transportation safety and security
Travel and tourism
Water quality
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Advisory bodies
Alabama
Aquaculture
Aquatic ecology
Coast guard
Congressional oversight
Department of Commerce
Emergency planning and evacuation
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Environmental protection
Environmental technology
Florida
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Government trust funds
Gulf of Mexico
Hunting and fishing
Intergovernmental relations
Louisiana
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine and inland water transportation
Marine pollution
Mississippi
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Oil and gas
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Pollution liability
Research administration and funding
Research and development
Seafood
State and local government operations
Technology assessment
Texas
Transportation safety and security
Travel and tourism
Water quality
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2352/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2352/BILLS-116hr2352ih.pdf |