US HB2369 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-22 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of the Interior to conduct a special resource study of Long Island, New York, with a particular focus on the Hempstead Plains, the areas surrounding Suffolk County Air Force Base, the hamlet of Bethpage, the hamlet of Port Washington, and the village of Farmingdale. Interior shall evaluate the national significance of the area based on an assessment of the aviation history of Long Island and determine the suitability and feasibility of designating the area as a unit of the National Park System in commemoration of Long Island's aviation history.
Title
Long Island Aviation History Act
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY] | Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] |
Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Gregory Meeks [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-04-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-04-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1330 (Related) 2019-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Subjects
Aviation and airports
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
New York State
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
New York State
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2369/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2369/BILLS-116hr2369ih.pdf |