US HB2371 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes a series of changes relating to Medicare coverage and requirements, particularly with respect to military retirees. Specifically, the bill (1) exempts certain military retirees who are under 65 years of age, and who no longer receive Social Security Disability Insurance benefits, from the requirement to enroll in Medicare medical services in order to be eligible for TRICARE; (2) increases funding for the Medicare Improvement Fund; and (3) temporarily provides for Medicare coverage of certain prostate cancer DNA Specimen Provenance Assay tests.
Title
HEARTS Act of 2019 Health Equity and Access for Returning Troops and Servicemembers Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-04-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-04-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3416 (Related) 2019-06-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB3429 (Related) 2020-12-07 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 116-620, Part I.
HB3429 (Related) 2020-12-07 - Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 116-620, Part I.
Subjects
Cancer
Congressional oversight
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health information and medical records
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Military medicine
Veterans' medical care
Congressional oversight
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Health information and medical records
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Military medicine
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2371/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2371/BILLS-116hr2371ih.pdf |