US HB2375 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Preserve Access to Affordable Generics and Biosimilars Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Preserve Access to Affordable Generics and Biosimilars Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2019-04-30HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-04-29HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-29HouseReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-29HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB64 (Related) 2019-01-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1344 (Related) 2019-03-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Antitrust, Commercial, and Administrative Law.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback