US HB2377 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 30-1)
Status: Introduced on April 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-26 - Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Protect Drinking Water from PFAS Act of 2019 This bill requires the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA) to address the level of perfluoroalkyl and polyfluoroalkyl substances (PFAS) in drinking water. Specifically, the EPA must publish a maximum contaminant level goal and promulgate a national primary drinking water regulation for total PFAS. PFAS are man-made chemicals that may lead to adverse human health effects.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Protect Drinking Water from PFAS Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-26HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote .
2019-09-26HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-05-13HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-04-30HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
2019-04-29HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-04-29HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1790 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Conference held.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback