US HB2382 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-9)
Status: Introduced on June 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 24 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Tax Return Due Date Simplification and Modernization Act of 2011 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to change tax return due dates for partnerships (from April 15 to March 15, with extensions until September 15), S corporations (from March 15 to March 31, with extensions until September 30), and C corporations (from March 15 to April 15, with extensions until October 15). Makes the new return date for C corporations with a fiscal year ending on June 30 applicable to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2021. Requires the Secretary of the Treasury, for taxable years beginning after December 31, 2011, to modify by regulation the due dates for extensions of tax returns for partnerships, estates, employee benefit plans, and tax-exempt organizations. Sets a due date of April 15 for the annual information return of a foreign trust with a U.S. owner and for the report of foreign bank and financial accounts (with extensions until October 15). Extends the automatic extension for corporate income tax returns from three to six months (seven months for C corporations with a fiscal year ending on June 30).
Title
Tax Return Due Date Simplification and Modernization Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Justin Amash [R-MI] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. John Campbell [R-CA] |
Rep. John Carney [D-DE] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] | Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] |
Rep. Joseph Crowley [D-NY] | Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] | Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY] |
Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Tim Griffin [R-AR] | Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] |
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Sander Levin [D-MI] |
Rep. Donald Manzullo [R-IL] | Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] | Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] | Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN] |
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] |
Rep. Mike Pompeo [R-KS] | Rep. David Price [D-NC] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] |
Rep. Steven Rothman [D-NJ] | Rep. Edward Royce [R-CA] | Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] |
Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-24 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
SB845 (Related) 2011-04-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of the Treasury
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Department of the Treasury
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/2382/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr2382/BILLS-112hr2382ih.pdf |