US HB2383 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on July 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Became Public Law No: 113-18.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-5)
Status: Passed on July 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-12 - Became Public Law No: 113-18.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the new Interstate Route 70 bridge over the Mississippi River that connects St. Louis, Missouri, to southwestern Illinois as the "Stan Musial Veterans Memorial Bridge."
Title
To designate the new Interstate Route 70 bridge over the Mississippi River connecting St. Louis, Missouri, and southwestern Illinois as the "Stan Musial Veterans Memorial Bridge".
Sponsors
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Emanuel Cleaver [D-MO] |
Rep. William Enyart [D-IL] | Rep. Sam Graves [R-MO] | Rep. Vicky Hartzler [R-MO] | Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] |
Rep. Adam Kinzinger [R-IL] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] | Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] | Rep. Blaine Luetkemeyer [R-MO] |
Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL] | Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] | Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO] |
Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-25 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass (Y: 395 N: 2 NV: 37 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-12 | House | Became Public Law No: 113-18. |
2013-07-12 | House | Signed by President. |
2013-07-02 | House | Presented to President. |
2013-06-28 | House | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2013-06-27 | House | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5509) |
2013-06-26 | House | Received in the Senate. |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2013-06-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2013-06-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 395 - 2 (Roll no. 287). (text: CR H4002) |
2013-06-25 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4008-4009) |
2013-06-25 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2013-06-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2383. |
2013-06-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4002-4005) |
2013-06-25 | House | Mr. Davis, Rodney moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2013-06-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2013-06-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
Same As/Similar To
HB420 (Related) 2013-01-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
SB166 (Related) 2013-03-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
SB166 (Related) 2013-03-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
Subjects
Athletes
Congressional tributes
Illinois
Missouri
Professional sports
Roads and highways
Transportation and public works
Congressional tributes
Illinois
Missouri
Professional sports
Roads and highways
Transportation and public works