US HB2397 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-6)
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Science, And Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the National Institute of Standards and Technology's Manufacturing USA program and extends through FY2024 and revises the Economic Development Administration's Regional Innovation Program. The bill grants certain authorities of the Department of Commerce under the Manufacturing USA program to additional federal agencies. All centers under the Manufacturing USA program shall (currently, may) conduct research and development and related activities. The Manufacturing USA program office must, among other things, help develop pilot programs that may be implemented for manufacturing innovation. The General Accountability Office shall triennially assess Manufacturing USA program operations.
Title
American Manufacturing Leadership Act
Sponsors
Rep. Haley Stevens [D-MI] | Rep. Troy Balderson [R-OH] | Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA] | Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY] |
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Anthony Gonzalez [R-OH] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] |
Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] | Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA] |
Rep. Kendra Horn [D-OK] | Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL] | Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] |
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] |
Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY] | Rep. Brenda Lawrence [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. |
2019-07-23 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7168-7170) |
2019-07-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2397. |
2019-07-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7168-7172) |
2019-07-23 | House | Ms. Johnson (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-06-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 89. |
2019-06-19 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 116-121. |
2019-05-01 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-05-01 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2019-04-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Congressional oversight
Economic development
Employment and training programs
Intergovernmental relations
Manufacturing
Performance measurement
Research and development
Science, technology, communications
Small business
Congressional oversight
Economic development
Employment and training programs
Intergovernmental relations
Manufacturing
Performance measurement
Research and development
Science, technology, communications
Small business