US HB2406 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 14.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration Commissioned Officer Corps Amendments Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration Commissioned Officer Corps Amendments Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-18HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 14.
2019-09-18HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-09-18HouseSubcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged.
2019-05-08HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-05-01HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2019-05-01HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
2019-04-30HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-30HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-30HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-30HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, Armed Services, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-30HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3323)
2019-04-30HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback