US HB2409 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 10 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Expanding Access to Capital for Rural Job Creators Act This bill requires the Advocate for Small Business Capital Formation within the Securities and Exchange Commission to report on issues encountered by rural-area small businesses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Expanding Access to Capital for Rural Job Creators Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-09 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 433 (Y: 413 N: 7 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
2019-07-09HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-07-09HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 413 - 7 (Roll no. 433). (text: CR H5285)
2019-07-09HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5288-5289)
2019-07-09HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-07-09HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2409.
2019-07-09HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5285-5287)
2019-07-09HouseMs. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-04-30HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
2019-04-30HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB566 (Same As) 2019-02-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback