US HB2410 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for the sealing or expungement of records relating to Federal nonviolent criminal offenses, and for other purposes.
Title
REDEEM Act Record Expungement Designed to Enhance Employment Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] |
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] |
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] | Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] |
Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] |
Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] |
Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2019-05-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Nutrition, Oversight, and Department Operations. |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1893 (Related) 2019-04-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB697 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB697 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Detention of persons
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Employee hiring
Evidence and witnesses
Food assistance and relief
Government studies and investigations
Judicial procedure and administration
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Lawyers and legal services
Licensing and registrations
Mental health
Personnel records
Poverty and welfare assistance
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
State and local government operations
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Crime and law enforcement
Criminal justice information and records
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Detention of persons
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Employee hiring
Evidence and witnesses
Food assistance and relief
Government studies and investigations
Judicial procedure and administration
Juvenile crime and gang violence
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Lawyers and legal services
Licensing and registrations
Mental health
Personnel records
Poverty and welfare assistance
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2410/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2410/BILLS-116hr2410ih.pdf |