US HB2414 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-07-16 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To amend the Morris K. Udall and Stewart L. Udall Foundation Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To amend the Morris K. Udall and Stewart L. Udall Foundation Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-16HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-05-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States.
2019-05-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2019-04-30HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-30HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committee on Natural Resources, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-04-30HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1345 (Related) 2019-06-19 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 118.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback