US HB2420 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 234-62)
Status: Engrossed on July 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 600.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-03 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 600.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
(Sec. 4) establishes the National Museum of the American Latino in the Smithsonian Institution. The purposes of the museum are to (1) illuminate Latino contributions to the story of the United States; (2) provide for the collection, study, research, publication, and establishment of exhibitions and programs related to Latino life, art, history, and culture; and (3) provide for collaboration with Smithsonian Institution museums and research centers and other museums and educational institutions in the United States and abroad to promote the study and appreciation of Latino life, art, history, culture, and their impact on society in the United States. (Sec. 5) The bill establishes a Board of Trustees for the museum to advise and assist the Board of Regents of the Smithsonian on all matters related to the administration and preservation of the museum. The Board of Trustees shall ensure that the exhibits and programs of the museum reflect the diversity of the political viewpoints held by Latinos on the events and issues related to Latino history in the United States. (Sec. 6) The Director of the museum shall manage the museum and may carry out educational and liaison programs in support of its goals. (Sec. 7) The Director of the Institute of Museum and Library Services shall establish and carry out specified grant programs and a scholarship program, including a grant program to promote the understanding of the Latin American diaspora in the United States. (Sec. 8) The Board of Regents shall designate a site for the museum and is authorized to design and construct it.
Title
National Museum of the American Latino Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 600. |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Committee on Rules and Administration. Reported by Senator Blunt without amendment. Without written report. |
2020-12-03 | Senate | Committee on Rules and Administration. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2020-07-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. |
2020-07-27 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-07-27 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3864-3866) |
2020-07-27 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2420. |
2020-07-27 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3864-3872) |
2020-07-27 | House | Mr. Aguilar moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-10-17 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1267 (Related) 2020-11-17 - Committee on Rules and Administration. Hearings held.
HB133 (Related) 2020-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-260.
HB133 (Related) 2020-12-27 - Became Public Law No: 116-260.
Subjects
Arts, culture, religion
Higher education
Historical and cultural resources
Humanities programs funding
Latin America
Minority education
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Smithsonian Institution
Student aid and college costs
U.S. history
Higher education
Historical and cultural resources
Humanities programs funding
Latin America
Minority education
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Smithsonian Institution
Student aid and college costs
U.S. history