US HB2422 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 71-13)
Status: Passed on December 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-302.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 71-13)
Status: Passed on December 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-11 - Became Public Law No: 115-302.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Action for Dental Health Act of 2017 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to reauthorize oral health promotion and disease prevention programs through FY2022. The Department of Health and Human Services may award grants or enter into contracts to collaborate with state, county, or local public officials and other stakeholders to develop and implement initiatives to: (1) improve oral health education and dental disease prevention; (2) reduce geographic barriers, language barriers, cultural barriers, and other similar barriers in the provision of dental services; (3) establish dental homes for children and adults; (4) reduce the use of emergency departments by individuals who seek dental services more appropriately delivered in a dental primary care setting; or (5) facilitate the provision of dental care to nursing home residents.
Title
Action for Dental Health Act of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 82 (Y: 387 N: 13 NV: 30 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-11 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-302. |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-11-28 | Senate | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to by voice vote. (text as House agreed to Senate Amendment: CR H9673) |
2018-11-28 | Senate | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment to H.R. 2422. |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Mr. Burgess moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H9673-9675) |
2018-10-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | S.Amdt.4057 Amendment SA 4057 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | S.Amdt.4057 Amendment SA 4057 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Alexander. (consideration: CR S6881; text: CR S6881) In the nature of a substitute. |
2018-10-11 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6880-6881) |
2018-10-11 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2018-02-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-02-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 387 - 13 (Roll no. 82). (text: CR H1243) |
2018-02-26 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1247-1248) |
2018-02-26 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2018-02-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2422. |
2018-02-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1243-1244) |
2018-02-26 | House | Mr. Burgess moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2017-09-25 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 238. |
2017-09-25 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 115-328. |
2017-07-27 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2017-07-27 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-06-29 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2017-06-29 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-05-19 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-05-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2017-05-15 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1084 (Related) 2017-03-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on General Farm Commodities and Risk Management.
SB3016 (Related) 2018-08-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 554.
SB3016 (Related) 2018-08-15 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 554.
Subjects
Dental care
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medical education
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Tax-exempt organizations
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medical education
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Tax-exempt organizations