US HB2422 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows claims to be brought against the United States for damages relating to the personal injury or death of a member of the Armed Forces arising out of a negligent or wrongful act or omission in providing medical, dental, or related health care functions at a military medical treatment facility. However, the bill does not apply to care provided at a medical treatment location deployed in an area of armed combat.
Title
SFC Richard Stayskal Military Medical Accountability Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Jackie Speier [D-CA] | Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC] | Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] |
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Sen. Markwayne Mullin [R-OK] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] |
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Paul Mitchell [R-MI] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] |
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Ben Cline [R-VA] |
Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2019-04-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
SB2451 (Related) 2019-09-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
SB2451 (Related) 2019-09-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Government liability
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Law
Military medicine
Military personnel and dependents
Congressional oversight
Government liability
Health care quality
Health facilities and institutions
Law
Military medicine
Military personnel and dependents
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2422/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2422/BILLS-116hr2422ih.pdf |