US HB2423 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - Became Public Law No: 116-71. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-25 - Became Public Law No: 116-71. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(Sec. 3) directs the Department of the Treasury to mint and issue up to 400,000 $1 silver coins that are emblematic of the women who played a vital role in rallying support for the 19th Amendment to the U.S. Constitution. (Sec. 5) Such coins may be issued during the period beginning on January 1, 2020, and ending on December 31, 2020. (Sec. 7) All surcharges received from the sales of such coins shall be paid to the American Women's History Initiative of the Smithsonian Institution.
Title
Women's Suffrage Centennial Commemorative Coin Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-25 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-71. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-11-25 | House | Signed by President. |
2019-11-18 | House | Presented to President. |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6358) |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate, read twice. |
2019-10-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8507-8508) |
2019-10-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2423. |
2019-10-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8507-8509) |
2019-10-28 | House | Mr. Scott, David moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-04-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-04-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1235 (Same As) 2019-06-05 - Held at the desk.
HCR72 (Related) 2019-11-14 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
HCR72 (Related) 2019-11-14 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
Currency
Finance and financial sector
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Smithsonian Institution
U.S. history
Voting rights
Women's rights
Finance and financial sector
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Smithsonian Institution
U.S. history
Voting rights
Women's rights