US HB2429 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Puerto Rico Task Force Economic Empowerment Act of 2017 Puerto Rico Opportunity, Small Business Prosperity, and Economic Revitalization Act of 2017 This bill amends the Small Business Act to modify requirements for the microloan program for Puerto Rico small businesses and increase access to capital for such program. The Small Business Administration shall establish: (1) a Veteran Business Outreach Center in Puerto Rico, and (2) a temporary Federal and State Technology (FAST) grant program to provide assistance to Puerto Rico businesses. The bill amends the Investment Company Act of 1940 to apply the oversight requirements of that Act to investment companies in U.S. territories. The bill includes Puerto Rico in the Department of Labor reemployment demonstration projects grant program. For FY2018, Labor may transfer funding to the Bureau of Labor Statistics for feasibility studies of the Puerto Rico economy. The bill amends Social Security Act provisions affecting hospitals in Puerto Rico and health care and prescription drug coverage in U.S. territories. The Office of National Drug Control Policy shall develop a publicly available Caribbean Border Counternarcotics Strategy, with emphasis on the borders of Puerto Rico and the U.S. Virgin Islands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Puerto Rico Task Force Economic Empowerment Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2017-05-19HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2017-05-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, the Judiciary, Oversight and Government Reform, Education and the Workforce, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-05-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, the Judiciary, Oversight and Government Reform, Education and the Workforce, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-05-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, the Judiciary, Oversight and Government Reform, Education and the Workforce, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-05-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, the Judiciary, Oversight and Government Reform, Education and the Workforce, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-05-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, the Judiciary, Oversight and Government Reform, Education and the Workforce, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-05-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, the Judiciary, Oversight and Government Reform, Education and the Workforce, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-05-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, the Judiciary, Oversight and Government Reform, Education and the Workforce, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-05-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, the Judiciary, Oversight and Government Reform, Education and the Workforce, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-05-16HouseReferred to the Committee on Small Business, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, the Judiciary, Oversight and Government Reform, Education and the Workforce, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2017-05-16HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1091 (Related) 2017-02-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Human Resources.
HB1366 (Related) 2017-05-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB154 (Related) 2017-08-02 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 194.
SB484 (Related) 2017-09-12 - Held at the desk.
HB2488 (Related) 2017-05-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
SB2873 (Related) 2018-05-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB5975 (Related) 2018-05-25 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Small Business, Financial Services, Oversight and Government Reform, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB3256 (Related) 2018-07-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB4319 (Related) 2017-11-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit.
HB5178 (Related) 2018-04-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 481.
SB526 (Related) 2018-12-20 - By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-452.

Subjects

Appropriations
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Border security and unlawful immigration
Business education
Caribbean area
Census and government statistics
Congressional oversight
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Labor
Disaster relief and insurance
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Employee hiring
Employment and training programs
Executive agency funding and structure
Financial services and investments
Foreign labor
Government information and archives
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government operations and politics
Government studies and investigations
Health care quality
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
Hospital care
Immigration status and procedures
Infectious and parasitic diseases
Inflation and prices
Interest, dividends, interest rates
Law enforcement administration and funding
Medicaid
Medicare
Performance measurement
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Puerto Rico
Securities
Small business
Small Business Administration
State and local finance
Travel and tourism
U.S. territories and protectorates
Unemployment
User charges and fees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Virgin Islands

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback