US HB2430 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 610.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-27 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 610.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
North Cascades National Park Service Complex Fish Stocking Act - Directs the Secretary of the Interior to authorize the stocking of fish in lakes in the North Cascades National Park, Ross Lake National Recreation Area, and Lake Chelan National Recreation Area (the North Cascades National Park Service Complex). Authorizes the Secretary to allow stocking in not more than 42 of the 91 lakes which have historically been stocked with fish. Instructs the Secretary to make use of relevant scientific information, including the plan and information gathered from the research and monitoring program specified below, in making fish stocking decisions under this Act. Requires the Secretary to coordinate the stocking of fish with the State of Washington. Requires the Secretary to continue a program of research and monitoring of the impacts of fish stocking on the resources of the applicable unit of the North Cascades National Park Service Complex and to report to Congress on the results of such research and monitoring.
Title
North Cascades National Park Service Complex Fish Stocking Act
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Baird [D-WA] | Rep. Norman Dicks [D-WA] | Rep. Doc Hastings [R-WA] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] |
Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-27 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 610. | |
2010-09-27 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Bingaman with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 111-324. | |
2010-08-05 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. | |
2009-07-22 | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. | |
2009-06-03 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. | |
2009-06-02 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-06-02 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6024) | |
2009-06-02 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2430. | |
2009-06-02 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6024-6025) | |
2009-06-02 | Mrs. Christensen moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2009-05-14 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Subjects
Fishes
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Washington State
Lakes and rivers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Washington State