US HB2431 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Became Public Law No: 113-86.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-06 - Became Public Law No: 113-86.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
National Integrated Drought Information System Reauthorization Act of 2014 - Amends the National Integrated Drought Information System Act of 2006 to specify that the National Integrated Drought Information System (NIDIS) Program's purpose shall be to better inform and provide for more timely decisionmaking to reduce drought related impacts and costs. Revises NIDIS functions to require the NIDIS, among other things, to: (1) provide an effective drought early warning system consisting of certain information, forecasts, and assessments on both national and regional levels; (2) build upon existing forecasting and assessment programs and partnerships through designation of one or more cooperative institutes to assist with NIDIS functions; and (3) continue ongoing research and monitoring activities related to drought and the role of extreme weather events and climate variability in drought. Requires the Under Secretary of Commerce for Oceans and Atmosphere (who is also the Administrator of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration [NOAA]) to report to Congress on the NIDIS Program. Reauthorizes NIDIS through FY2018.
Title
National Integrated Drought Information System Reauthorization Act of 2014
Sponsors
Rep. Ralph Hall [R-TX] | Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2014-02-10 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended (Y: 365 N: 21 NV: 45 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-06 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 113-86. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1132) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 307. |
2014-02-10 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 365 - 21 (Roll no. 55). (text: CR H1691) |
2014-02-10 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1697-1698) |
2014-02-10 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2014-02-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2431. |
2014-02-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1691-1693) |
2014-02-10 | House | Mr. Hall moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2014-02-06 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 258. |
2014-02-06 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 113-348. |
2013-12-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2013-12-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2013-09-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment. |
2013-06-19 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
Same As/Similar To
SB376 (Related) 2014-02-04 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Atmospheric science and weather
Congressional oversight
Emergency planning and evacuation
Farmland
Government information and archives
Natural disasters
Science, technology, communications
Water use and supply
Congressional oversight
Emergency planning and evacuation
Farmland
Government information and archives
Natural disasters
Science, technology, communications
Water use and supply