US HB2460 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3509)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3509)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of Transportation to establish a working group to (1) identify obstacles to safe, humane, and market-efficient transport of livestock, insects, and agricultural commodities; and (2) develop guidelines and recommended regulatory or legislative actions to improve the safe, humane, and efficient transport of livestock, insects, and agricultural commodities.
Title
Modernizing Agricultural Transportation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gregory Pence [R-IN] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC] | Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] |
Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Trey Hollingsworth [R-IN] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] |
Rep. Denver Riggleman [R-VA] | Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Ross Spano [R-FL] |
Rep. James Baird [R-IN] | Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] | Rep. Steve Watkins [R-KS] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] |
Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3509) |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Highways and Transit. |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. |
2019-05-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB600 (Same As) 2019-02-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1267 (Related) 2020-11-17 - Committee on Rules and Administration. Hearings held.
SB1267 (Related) 2020-11-17 - Committee on Rules and Administration. Hearings held.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
Agricultural marketing and promotion
Department of Transportation
Executive agency funding and structure
Fruit and vegetables
Insects
Livestock
Motor carriers
Roads and highways
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation safety and security
Worker safety and health
Advisory bodies
Agricultural marketing and promotion
Department of Transportation
Executive agency funding and structure
Fruit and vegetables
Insects
Livestock
Motor carriers
Roads and highways
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation safety and security
Worker safety and health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2460/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2460/BILLS-116hr2460ih.pdf |