US HB2468 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 43-5)
Status: Passed on January 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-05 - Became Public Law No: 116-292.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Preferences for grants under the children's asthma treatment program states that require schools to establish allergy and asthma management programs that include individual action plans for students diagnosed with allergies or asthma.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School-Based Allergies and Asthma Management Program Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-05HouseBecame Public Law No: 116-292.
2021-01-05HouseSigned by President.
2020-12-24HousePresented to President.
2020-12-18SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2020-12-17SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.
2020-12-17SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7642)
2020-09-30SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
2020-09-29HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-09-29HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5004)
2020-09-29HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2468.
2020-09-29HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5004-5006)
2020-09-29HouseMr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2020-09-22HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 430.
2020-09-22HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-530.
2020-07-15HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2020-07-15HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-03-11HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote .
2020-03-11HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-01-08HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-05-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-05-02HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
2019-05-02HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback