US HB2470 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on July 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-08-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-08-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ensuring Servicemembers' Electronic Records' Viability Act or the E-SERV Act - Amends the Wounded Warrior Act to make the interagency program office of the Department of Defense (DOD) and the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) established by such Act the single: (1) point of accountability and authority (currently, accountability only) for the DOD and VA in the development and implementation of electronic health record systems or capabilities (including capabilities existing before January 16, 2008) that allow for full interoperability of personal health care information between such agencies; and (2) program office of such Departments that is responsible for the development, implementation, and sustainment of all electronic health record systems and capabilities. Requires: (1) the Director of such office to report directly to the DOD and VA Secretaries (or a jointly delegated official of each Department not lower than Deputy Secretary) without interposition of any other supervising official, and (2) the office to carry out the programming and budgeting of such activities.
Title
E-SERV Act
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2011-07-20 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2011-07-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2011-07-08 | House | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs |
2011-07-08 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2011-07-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Department of Defense
Department of Veterans Affairs
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Military medicine
Veterans' medical care
Department of Defense
Department of Veterans Affairs
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Health information and medical records
Military medicine
Veterans' medical care
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/2470/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr2470/BILLS-112hr2470ih.pdf |