US HB2470 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, and Nutrition.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, and Nutrition Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 20 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-08-13 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, and Nutrition.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, and Nutrition Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making Work and Marriage Pay Act of 2013 - Establishes the National Commission on Effective Marginal Tax Rates for Low-Income Families to study, report, and make recommendations on policy changes to mitigate the impact of the effective marginal tax rate and of phaseouts in federal benefits on low-income earners and their families.
Title
Making Work and Marriage Pay Act of 2013
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Petri [R-WI] | Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME] | Rep. Niki Tsongas [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, and Nutrition. |
2013-07-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training. |
2013-07-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2013-06-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred to House Financial Services |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Veterans' Affairs, Financial Services, Energy and Commerce, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2013-06-20 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E927) |
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Child care and development
Child health
Food assistance and relief
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Health care costs and insurance
Housing finance and home ownership
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Income tax rates
Medicaid
Policy sciences
Poverty and welfare assistance
Public housing
Social welfare
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
Child care and development
Child health
Food assistance and relief
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government studies and investigations
Health care costs and insurance
Housing finance and home ownership
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Income tax rates
Medicaid
Policy sciences
Poverty and welfare assistance
Public housing
Social welfare
Veterans' loans, housing, homeless programs
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2470/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2470/BILLS-113hr2470ih.pdf |