US HB2477 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-7)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-15 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

BENES Act of 2019 Beneficiary Enrollment Notification and Eligibility Simplification Act of 2019 This bill makes a series of changes to, and requires additional notifications regarding, the Medicare enrollment process. Specifically, the bill changes the Medicare general enrollment period to October 15-December 31, and requires coverage to begin on the first day of the month following enrollment. (Currently, the general enrollment period is January 1-March 31, and coverage begins July 1.) The bill also generally requires coverage to begin on the first day of the month following enrollment for individuals who enroll in the latter months of their initial enrollment period. (Currently, the longer an individual waits to enroll, the more delayed the effective date of coverage.) The bill also requires Social Security account statements for individuals ages 60 to 64 to include information about Medicare eligibility, late enrollment penalties, coordination of benefits, and special enrollment populations (e.g., veterans).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

BENES Act of 2019 Beneficiary Enrollment Notification and Eligibility Simplification Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-15HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2020-07-15HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-03-11HouseForwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) .
2020-03-11HouseSubcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-01-08HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-05-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-05-02HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-02HouseReferred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-02HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB1280 (Same As) 2019-05-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback