US HB2487 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fry Scholarship Enhancement Act Includes under the Yellow Ribbon G.I. Education Enhancement Program (public-private contributions for educational assistance in addition to post-9/11 educational assistance) the child of an individual who, on or after September 11, 2001, dies in the line of duty while serving on active duty.
Title
Fry Scholarship Enhancement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2015-05-21 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2015-05-21 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1460 (Related) 2015-09-16 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Conflicts and wars
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Public-private cooperation
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Conflicts and wars
Military operations and strategy
Military personnel and dependents
Public-private cooperation
Student aid and college costs
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2487/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2487/BILLS-114hr2487ih.pdf |