US HB2488 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-3)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Small Business.
Pending: House Small Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Puerto Rico Small Business Assistance Act of 2017 This bill amends the Small Business Act regarding small businesses that have their principal office in Puerto Rico, including to temporarily: increase the total amount of loans outstanding and committed to any microloan intermediary if at least 20% of the intermediary's loans are made to such businesses; waive the Small Business Administration (SBA) Microloan Program's limit on an intermediary's spending on technical assistance for prospective borrowers if 25% of the intermediary's loans are made to these businesses; reduce or eliminate SBA fees on certain loans to such businesses; and give federal contract preference to such businesses, transfer specified technology or surplus property to them, and provide subcontracting incentives for their protege firms. The SBA shall establish: (1) a Veteran Business Outreach Center in Puerto Rico, and (2) a temporary Federal and State Technology (FAST) grant program to provide assistance to Puerto Rico businesses. The SBA district office in Puerto Rico must temporarily report annually to Congress and the SBA on its activities in Puerto Rico.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Puerto Rico Small Business Assistance Act of 2017

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-17HouseReferred to the House Committee on Small Business.
2017-05-17HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB2429 (Related) 2017-05-22 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HB5178 (Related) 2018-04-10 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 481.
SB526 (Related) 2018-12-20 - By Senator Risch from Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship filed written report. Report No. 115-452.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback