US HB2490 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-27 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs the Department of the Interior to conduct a study on feasibility of designating as a national historic trail the Chief Standing Bear Trail extending 550 miles from Niobrara, Nebraska, to Ponca City, Oklahoma, which follows the route taken by Chief Standing Bear and the Ponca people during federal Indian removal, and 550 miles from Ponca City through Omaha to Niobrara, Nebraska, which follows the return route taken by Chief Standing Bear and the Ponca people.
Title
To amend the National Trails System Act to direct the Secretary of the Interior to conduct a study on the feasibility of designating the Chief Standing Bear National Historic Trail, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 73 (Y: 402 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2020-02-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-02-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 402 - 10 (Roll no. 73). (text: CR H1206) |
2020-02-26 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H1212-1213) |
2020-02-26 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2020-02-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2490. |
2020-02-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H1206-1207) |
2020-02-26 | House | Mr. Neguse moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-10-11 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 184. |
2019-10-11 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-232. |
2019-09-18 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-09-18 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-09-18 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2019-05-22 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-05-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Federal-Indian relations
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Kansas
Nebraska
Oklahoma
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
U.S. history
Government studies and investigations
Historic sites and heritage areas
Kansas
Nebraska
Oklahoma
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
U.S. history