US HB2492 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-25 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the government to pay 75% of the costs, including repair costs, for the Bureau of Reclamation's Milk River Project, which provides water for irrigation of land in Montana.
Title
St. Mary's Reinvestment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Gianforte [R-MT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-05-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-05-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-05-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1305 (Same As) 2019-06-26 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water and Power. Hearings held.
Subjects
Dams and canals
Lakes and rivers
Montana
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water storage
Lakes and rivers
Montana
Water resources development
Water resources funding
Water storage
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2492/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2492/BILLS-116hr2492ih.pdf |