US HB2504 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-06 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To ensure fair treatment in licensing requirements for the export of certain echinoderms. (Sec. 1) This bill: (1) exempts exporters of sea urchins and sea cucumbers that are designated as food for humans or animals or taken for recreational purposes from licensing requirements; and (2) requires the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service to amend regulations concerning transporting wildlife to clarify that those sea urchins and sea cucumbers are fishery products exempt from the export permission requirements under the Endangered Species Act of 1973. Thus, those exporters will be exempted from: (1) inspections to ensure shipments of those fishery products do not contain endangered or threatened species, and (2) related inspection fees.
Title
To ensure fair treatment in licensing requirements for the export of certain echinoderms.
Sponsors
Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] | Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
2018-02-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-02-05 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H753) |
2018-02-05 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2504. |
2018-02-05 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H753-755) |
2018-02-05 | House | Mr. Gosar moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2018-01-10 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 376. |
2018-01-10 | House | Committee on Foreign Affairs discharged. |
2018-01-10 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-506, Part I. |
2017-11-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-11-08 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans Discharged. |
2017-11-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-11-07 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-05-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Power and Oceans. |
2017-05-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-17 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-05-17 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1206 (Related) 2017-05-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB2663 (Related) 2018-04-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB2663 (Related) 2018-04-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Department of the Interior
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental protection
Hunting and fishing
Licensing and registrations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Seafood
Trade restrictions
User charges and fees
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Department of the Interior
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental protection
Hunting and fishing
Licensing and registrations
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Seafood
Trade restrictions
User charges and fees
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection