US HB251 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-18 - Became Public Law No: 116-2. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-18 - Became Public Law No: 116-2. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends by 15 months the Department of Homeland Security's Chemical Facility Anti-Terrorism Standards Program.
Title
Chemical Facility Anti-Terrorism Standards Program Extension Act
Sponsors
Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Mike D. Rogers [R-AL] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] | Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. John Shimkus [R-IL] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-08 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 14 (Y: 414 N: 3 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-18 | House | Became Public Law No: 116-2. (TXT | PDF) |
2019-01-18 | House | Signed by President. |
2019-01-18 | House | Presented to President. |
2019-01-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-01-17 | House | On motion that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H696) |
2019-01-17 | House | The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on the motion to suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments to H.R. 251. |
2019-01-17 | House | Mr. Thompson (MS) moved that the House suspend the rules and agree to the Senate amendments. (consideration: CR H696-698) |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | S.Amdt.4 Amendment SA 4 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | S.Amdt.4 Amendment SA 4 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Johnson. (consideration: CR S279; text: CR S279) To amend the title. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment and an amendment to the Title by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | S.Amdt.3 Amendment SA 3 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | S.Amdt.3 Amendment SA 3 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Johnson. (consideration: CR S279; text: CR S279) To extend by 15 months the Chemical Facility Anti-Terrorism Standards Program of the Department of Homeland Security. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S279) |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 8. |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read the first time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under Read the First Time. |
2019-01-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-01-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 3 (Roll no. 14). (text: CR H266) |
2019-01-08 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H276-277) |
2019-01-08 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2019-01-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 251. |
2019-01-08 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H266-270) |
2019-01-08 | House | Mr. Thompson (MS) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2019-01-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3256 (Related) 2020-09-21 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 427.
HB6160 (Related) 2020-03-16 - Received in the Senate.
SB3506 (Related) 2020-03-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB4148 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Became Public Law No: 116-150. (TXT | PDF)
SB4197 (Related) 2020-07-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
HB6160 (Related) 2020-03-16 - Received in the Senate.
SB3506 (Related) 2020-03-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB4148 (Related) 2020-07-22 - Became Public Law No: 116-150. (TXT | PDF)
SB4197 (Related) 2020-07-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Civil actions and liability
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Homeland security
Industrial facilities
Performance measurement
Personnel records
Terrorism
Civil actions and liability
Criminal justice information and records
Department of Homeland Security
Emergency management
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Homeland security
Industrial facilities
Performance measurement
Personnel records
Terrorism