US HB2519 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Substance Abuse and Mental Health Services Administration to award grants to qualifying emergency departments for the purpose of supporting mental-health services. Specifically, grant recipients must use funds to support the provision of follow-up services for individuals who present for care of acute mental-health episodes, such as placement in appropriate facilities.
Title
Improving Mental Health Access from the Emergency Department Act of 2020
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2020-09-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-09-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5016) |
2020-09-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2519. |
2020-09-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5016-5017) |
2020-09-29 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-09-29 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 444. |
2020-09-29 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-544. |
2020-09-09 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2020-09-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-06-30 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-05-03 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-05-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1334 (Related) 2019-05-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Mental health
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Mental health