US HB2532 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the management of grizzly bears (Ursus arctos horribilis) except for grizzly bears that (1) belong to a population that is listed as a threatened or an endangered species; (2) are taken, possessed, or transported in Alaska; or (3) are taken in self-defense or to save the life of another person in immediate danger. The Department of the Interior may issue a permit for taking (e.g., killing, harming, or capturing), possessing, or transporting grizzly bears, or their parts if such taking, possession, or transportation is for purposes of science, exhibition, tribal religion, agricultural protection, or public safety. Such permits must be compatible with the protection of the grizzly bear species or a population of grizzly bears occupying a geographically distinct area. In addition, Interior must establish (1) a Grizzly Bear Scientific Committee, and (2) a grant program for assisting livestock producers with issues of livestock predation. Finally, the bill provides for the reintroduction of grizzly bears on tribal land.
Title
Tribal Heritage and Grizzly Bear Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] |
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture. |
2019-05-15 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-05-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Animals
Civil actions and liability
Crimes against animals and natural resources
Federal-Indian relations
Government studies and investigations
Hunting and fishing
Indian lands and resources rights
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Livestock
Mammals
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Animals
Civil actions and liability
Crimes against animals and natural resources
Federal-Indian relations
Government studies and investigations
Hunting and fishing
Indian lands and resources rights
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Livestock
Mammals
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2532/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2532/BILLS-116hr2532ih.pdf |