US HB2534 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Generally provides statutory authority for the prohibition against securities trading, as well as related communications to others, by a person aware of material, nonpublic information. The bill further provides, for purposes of establishing a violation of this prohibition, that it is not necessary for such a person to know specifically how such information was obtained or whether a personal benefit was paid or promised.
Title
Insider Trading Prohibition Act
Sponsors
Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-05 - House - On passage RC# 649 (Y: 410 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - House - On agreeing to the Huizenga amendment (A002) H.Amdt.697 RC# 648 (Y: 196 N: 231 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-12-05 - House - On agreeing to the Huizenga amendment (A002) H.Amdt.697 RC# 648 (Y: 196 N: 231 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2019-12-05 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-12-05 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 410 - 13 (Roll no. 649). |
2019-12-05 | House | The House adopted the amendment as agreed to by the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union. |
2019-12-05 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2019-12-05 | House | The House rose from the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union to report H.R. 2534. |
2019-12-05 | House | H.Amdt.697 On agreeing to the Huizenga amendment (A002) Failed by recorded vote: 196 - 231 (Roll no. 648). |
2019-12-05 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 739, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the Huizenga amendment No. 2. |
2019-12-05 | House | H.Amdt.697 Amendment (A002) offered by Mr. Huizenga. (consideration: CR H9276-9278; text: CR H9276) |
2019-12-05 | House | H.Amdt.696 On agreeing to the McHenry amendment (A001) Agreed to by voice vote. |
2019-12-05 | House | DEBATE - Pursuant to the provisions of H.Res. 739, the Committee of the Whole proceeded with 10 minutes of debate on the McHenry amendment No. 1. |
2019-12-05 | House | H.Amdt.696 Amendment (A001) offered by Mr. McHenry. (consideration: CR H9275-9276; text: CR H9275) |
2019-12-05 | House | GENERAL DEBATE - The Committee of the Whole proceeded with one hour of general debate on H.R. 2534. |
2019-12-05 | House | The Speaker designated the Honorable Terri A. Sewell to act as Chairwoman of the Committee. |
2019-12-05 | House | House resolved itself into the Committee of the Whole House on the state of the Union pursuant to H. Res. 739 and Rule XVIII. |
2019-12-05 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2534 and H. Con. Res. 77. Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 2534 under a structured rule, and makes in order that a motion to discharge H. Con. Res. 77 shall be in order on December 11, 2019. |
2019-12-05 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 739. (consideration: CR H9271-9279) |
2019-12-03 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 739 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 2534 and H. Con. Res. 77. Resolution provides for consideration of H.R. 2534 under a structured rule, and makes in order that a motion to discharge H. Con. Res. 77 shall be in order on December 11, 2019. |
2019-09-27 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 172. |
2019-09-27 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 116-219. |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2019-05-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HR739 (Related) 2019-12-04 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Finance and financial sector
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Securities
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government information and archives
Securities